Chairman of the board ford motor company
WebMar 15, 2024 · Edsel Ford was elected to Ford’s board on Jan. 18, 1988, at age 39, together with his cousin, Bill Ford, then 30. He currently is a member of the board’s finance committee and sustainability and innovation committee. “It has been my honor and privilege to serve on Ford’s board of directors for more than three decades,” says Edsel Ford. WebMember, Board of Directors, Ford Motor Company. Dianne Craig. President, Lincoln. 1; 2... 9; 10; Items per page. 10 10; 20; 50; 100; Ford Media Center. News; Multimedia; …
Chairman of the board ford motor company
Did you know?
WebMar 10, 2005 · William Clay Ford, the last surviving grandson of Henry Ford, plans to retire from the Ford Motor Co. Board of Directors after nearly 57 years, the company announced Wednesday. Ford, who turns 80 ... WebApr 13, 2024 · Executive Chairman of the Board James Duncan Farley President, Chief Executive Officer, Director John T. Lawler Chief Financial Officer Anning Chen President and Chief Executive Officer of...
WebBenson Ford Sr. (July 20, 1919 – July 27, 1978), originally named Edsel Ford Jr, was an American businessman in the automotive industry, a vice-president of Ford Motor Company, and national co-chairman of the National Conference of Christians and Jews.Benson Ford remains famous for: being the first prominent person in the Ford … WebOn November 10, 1960, Iacocca was named vice-president and general manager of the Ford Division; in January 1965 Ford's vice-president, car and truck group; in 1967, executive vice-president; and president on …
WebFord Motor Co. company and executive profile by Barron's. View the latest F company infomation and executive bios. ... Board Members. William Clay Ford Jr. Executive … WebDavid McClelland is vice president, Strategy and Partnerships, effective Nov. 1, 2024. He leads Corporate Strategy, Business Development and Global Data Insights and Analytics. McClelland also is chairman of the …
Web19 rows · CEO and Chairman of Ford Motor Company No. Name Took office Left office …
WebAs executive chair of Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford Jr. is leading the company that put the world on wheels into the 21st century. He joined the board of directors in 1988 and has been its chair since … fallout 4 additem t45 helmetWebApr 1, 2024 · Former Ford CEO Jim Hackett received total compensation of $16.7 million in 2024 for running the company for nine months, according to documents the Dearborn automaker released Thursday. That's... fallout 4 add item modWebMar 7, 2003 · Comments of William F. Ezzell, CPA, Chairman, Board of Directors; Barry C. Melancon, CPA President and CEO, American Institute of Certified Public Accountants, February 18, 2003 (File name: wfezzell1.htm) ... The Ford Motor Company, February 18, 2003 (File name: jmrintamaki1.htm) controversy\u0027s 4wWebJohn S. Weinberg. If you would like to contact Ford’s Board of Directors please use the following address: Ford Motor Company, Customer Relationship Center, P.O. Box 6248, Dearborn, MI 48126, U.S.A. Please … fallout 4 add legendary effectsWebJul 31, 2013 · Bill Ford today is the chairman of Ford Motor Co. From 2001 to 2006, he served as the company's chief executive. ... The board and Ford family, at the urging of W.C. Ford, installed Bill as CEO ... controversy\u0027s 4Web1 day ago · Apr 12, 2024, 10:35 ET. ATLANTA, April 12, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Georgia Power announced today that it has elected Steven R. Ewing to the company's board of … controversy\u0027s 4kWeb1 day ago · Efforts kicked into high gear in 2024 when Michigan lost an $11.4 billion investment by Ford Motor Co. and joint-venture partner SK On to build EV assembly … controversy\u0027s 41